IL HB4707 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0712
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0712
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Business Enterprise for Minorities, Females, and Persons with Disabilities Act. Provides that the Act is repealed on June 30, 2016 (now, June 30, 2012). Effective immediately.
Title
BEP-SUNSET EXTENSION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 97-0712 |
2012-06-27 | House | Effective Date June 27, 2012 |
2012-06-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2012-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2012-05-22 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2012 |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 24, 2012 |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 007-000-002 |
2012-04-11 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2012-03-27 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2012-03-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-002-000 |
2012-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-02-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-004-000 |
2012-02-21 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan A. Gordon |
2012-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 575 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |