IL HB4705 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that, in addition to any other tax that may be imposed, a municipality may also impose, by ordinance, a tax upon all persons engaged in the municipality in the business of acting as a resale facilitator. Provides that the tax may be imposed, in one cent increments, at a rate not to exceed $0.05 of the selling price of all tickets or other licenses resold by or through the resale facilitator for amusements taking place within the municipality. Provides that the tax does not apply to: (i) the original sale of a ticket or license by the owner, operator, or manager of an amusement, either directly or through a third party; or (ii) resales by or to ticket brokers registered with the Secretary of State under the Ticket Sale and Resale Act. Defines terms. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Municipal Ticket and License Reselling Tax Fund.
Title
MUNI-TICKET&LICENSE RESELLING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-18 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.930 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-42-1.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |