IL HB4690 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0708
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. With respect to the removal or dismissal of teachers and principals, removes a provision that specifies that if the Governor has declared a disaster due to a public health emergency pursuant to the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act, pre-hearing and hearing requirements are paused and do not begin to toll until the proclamation is no longer in effect. Requires any teacher or principal who has been charged with engaging in acts of corporal punishment, physical abuse, grooming, or sexual misconduct and who previously paused pre-hearing procedures or a hearing pursuant to Public Act 101-643 to proceed with the selection of a hearing officer or hearing date; allows the parties to mutually waive timelines. Provides that all timelines in cases concerning corporal punishment, physical abuse, grooming, or sexual misconduct shall be reset to begin the day after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that any teacher or principal charged with engaging in acts of corporal punishment, physical abuse, grooming, or sexual misconduct on or after the effective date of the amendatory Act may not pause pre-hearing procedures or a hearing. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH-DISMISS TEACHER/PRINCIPAL
Sponsors
Rep. Michelle Mussman [D] | Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Sen. Christopher Belt [D] |
Sen. Robert Martwick [D] | Sen. Diane Pappas [D] | Sen. Emil Jones [D] | Sen. Cristina Pacione-Zayas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0708 |
2022-04-22 | House | Effective Date April 22, 2022 |
2022-04-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Diane Pappas |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 012-000-000 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2022-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-02 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Greg Harris |
2022-03-01 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2022-02-16 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2022-02-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |