IL HB4688 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-08 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0529
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Water Supply Regulation Act. Provides that the owners or official custodians of public water supplies shall comply with the recommendations on optimal fluoridation for community water levels as proposed and adopted by the U.S. Department of Health and Human Services. Effective immediately.
Title
PUBLIC WATER SUPPLY REGULATION
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Tryon [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Reginald Phillips [R] |
Sen. Dave Syverson [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-24 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-08 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0529 |
2016-07-08 | House | Effective Date July 8, 2016 |
2016-07-08 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2016-05-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 113-000-000 |
2016-05-26 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Environment; 017-000-000 |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Environment |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-25 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2016-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2016-05-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Public Health; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Postponed - Public Health |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Dave Syverson |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 14, 2016 |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000 |
2016-04-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-04 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment; 017-000-000 |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2016-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 40 | 7a | Amended Code | Citation Text |