IL HB4687 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Removes provisions related to the Adjustable Block Program and restores certain provisions of the Act to the form in which they existed before their amendment by Public Acts 99-906 and 102-662. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Restores certain provisions of the Act regarding greenhouse gas emissions to the form in which they existed before their amendment by Public Act 102-662. Makes conforming changes in various Acts.
Title
ENERGY-ADJUST BLOCK PROG & GHG
Sponsors
Rep. Tim Ozinga [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-22 | House | To Clean Energy Subcommittee |
2024-03-05 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2024-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tim Ozinga |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-129 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-56 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 730 | 5-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 730 | 5-60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-108 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 16-111.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 5 | 8-218 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 55 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 9.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-12020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4687&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4687.htm |