IL HB4684 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-23 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that if the court enters an order for the detention of the defendant, the defendant shall be brought to trial on the offense for which the defendant is detained within 120 (rather than 90) days after the date on which the order for detention was entered. Provides that if the defendant is not brought to trial within the 120 (rather than 90) day period, the defendant shall not be denied pretrial release. Provides that in computing the 120 (rather than 90) day period, the court shall omit any period of delay resulting from a continuance granted at the request of the defendant.
Title
CRIM PRO-PRETRIAL DETENTION
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Chris Bos [R] | Rep. Dave Severin [R] |
Rep. Amy Grant [R] | Rep. Patrick Windhorst [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2022-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-02-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jackie Haas |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
725 | 5 | 110-6.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4684&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4684.htm |