IL HB4684 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 23 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that if an employer fails to transmit required contributions to the System for more than 120 days after the payment of those contributions is due, the Board may certify to the State Comptroller the amount of those delinquent employer contributions and the State Comptroller shall deduct the certified amount from State funds to the employer and remit the amount deducted to the System. Provides that if State funds from which those deductions may be made are not available or if deductions are delayed for longer than 120 days after the date of the certification to the Comptroller, the Board may proceed against the employer to recover the amounts of such delinquent payments in the appropriate circuit court. Adds similar provisions if the employer is a community college district. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-SURS-EMPLOYER CONTRIB

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 059-000-000
2018-05-02SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 3, 2018
2018-05-02SenateSecond Reading
2018-04-25SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2018
2018-04-25SenateApproved for Consideration Assignments
2018-03-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-03-09SenateFirst Reading
2018-03-09SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino
2018-03-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-03-09SenateArrive in Senate
2018-03-07HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-001
2018-03-06HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-06HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-000-000
2018-02-14HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40515-155.1New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback