IL HB4684 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1134
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act. Provides that for purposes of determining an amount of child support, the list of items that are deducted from income (such as income tax and FICA withholding, pension contributions, union dues, health insurance, and specified expenditures) is expanded to include foster care payments paid by the Department of Children and Family Services for providing licensed foster care to a foster child. Effective immediately.
Title
CHILD SUPPORT-INC-FOSTER CARE
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Feigenholtz [D] | Rep. Naomi Jakobsson [D] | Rep. Louis Lang [D] | Rep. Karen May [D] |
Rep. Carol Sente [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-21 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-1134 | |
2010-07-21 | Effective Date July 21, 2010 | |
2010-07-21 | Governor Approved | |
2010-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Passed Both Houses | |
2010-04-27 | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 | |
2010-04-21 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2010 | |
2010-04-21 | Second Reading | |
2010-04-20 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2010 | |
2010-04-20 | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 | |
2010-04-13 | Assigned to Judiciary | |
2010-03-17 | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Assignments | |
2010-03-17 | First Reading | |
2010-03-17 | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading February 18, 2010 | |
2010-02-17 | Arrive in Senate | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz | |
2010-02-17 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Karen May | |
2010-02-17 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 | |
2010-02-16 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-16 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-11 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang | |
2010-02-10 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2010-02-10 | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 014-001-000 | |
2010-02-03 | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee | |
2010-01-04 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-01-04 | First Reading | |
2009-11-18 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |