IL HB4664 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Life Care Facilities Act. Adds provisions concerning required disclosures and life care contract requirements for providers under the Act. Provides that at the time of or before the execution of a life care contract, or at the time of or before to the transfer of any money or other property to a provider by or on behalf of a prospective resident, whichever shall first occur, a provider shall deliver a disclosure statement to the person with whom the life care contract is to be entered into that contains specified information. Provides that residents may receive, upon request, specified information from providers and may submit comments. Provides that providers shall, to the maximum extent practicable, offer specified explanations, inform residents of certain matters, and make use of specified standards and practices. Provides that a violation of these provisions by a provider of a facility is an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall take specified enforcement actions if he or she receives notice from an escrow agent that specified provisions of the Act have not been complied with. Provides that the Secretary of Professional and Financial Regulation may conduct audits of providers. Provides that a provider shall provide all residents of a facility and the Department of Public Health with a printed report that contains certain information. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall provide the public with online access to the annual reports, inspection reports, and other specified information. Provides that an increase in a regular periodic charge not outlined in a life care contract must be approved by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation. Makes other changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LIFE CARE FACILITIES-CONTRACTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-04-24HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-24HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-03-07HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-003-000
2018-03-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-02-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-21HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
2018-02-13HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2018-02-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-07HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2104010Amended CodeCitation Text
2104010.2New CodeSee Bill Text
2104010.3New CodeSee Bill Text
2104010.4New CodeSee Bill Text
210404.1New CodeSee Bill Text
210405Amended CodeCitation Text
210406Amended CodeCitation Text
210409Amended CodeCitation Text
8155052VVVNew CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback