IL HB4664 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Life Care Facilities Act. Adds provisions concerning required disclosures and life care contract requirements for providers under the Act. Provides that at the time of or before the execution of a life care contract, or at the time of or before to the transfer of any money or other property to a provider by or on behalf of a prospective resident, whichever shall first occur, a provider shall deliver a disclosure statement to the person with whom the life care contract is to be entered into that contains specified information. Provides that residents may receive, upon request, specified information from providers and may submit comments. Provides that providers shall, to the maximum extent practicable, offer specified explanations, inform residents of certain matters, and make use of specified standards and practices. Provides that a violation of these provisions by a provider of a facility is an unlawful practice under the Consumer Fraud and Deceptive Business Practices Act. Provides that the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation shall take specified enforcement actions if he or she receives notice from an escrow agent that specified provisions of the Act have not been complied with. Provides that the Secretary of Professional and Financial Regulation may conduct audits of providers. Provides that a provider shall provide all residents of a facility and the Department of Public Health with a printed report that contains certain information. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall provide the public with online access to the annual reports, inspection reports, and other specified information. Provides that an increase in a regular periodic charge not outlined in a life care contract must be approved by the Secretary of Financial and Professional Regulation. Makes other changes.
Title
LIFE CARE FACILITIES-CONTRACTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 013-003-000 |
2018-03-01 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-02-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-21 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2018-02-13 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kathleen Willis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
210 | 40 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 40 | 10.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 40 | 10.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 40 | 10.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 40 | 4.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
210 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 40 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
210 | 40 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
815 | 505 | 2VVV | New Code | See Bill Text |