IL HB4656 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code, the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971, the Counties Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, the School Code, the Health Maintenance Organization Act, the Limited Health Service Organization Act, the Voluntary Health Services Plans Act, and the Illinois Public Aid Code to require coverage for hearing instruments and related services for all individuals 65 years of age and older when a hearing care professional prescribes a hearing instrument. Provides that an insurer shall provide coverage for hearing instruments subject to certain restrictions. Provides that an insurer shall not be required to pay a claim if the insured filed such a claim 24 months prior to the date of filing the claim with the insurer and the claim was paid by any insurer.
Title
INS CODE-HEARING AIDS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Remains in Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Motion Do Pass - Lost Insurance: Health & Life Committee; 008-005-000 |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Insurance: Health & Life Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-07 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-07 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 10-22.3f | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 125 | 5-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 130 | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 165 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
215 | 5 | 356z.29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-16.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 375 | 6.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
55 | 5 | 5-1069.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
65 | 5 | 10-4-2.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4656&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4656.htm |