IL HB4642 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Exempts from disclosure as private information all patient-related information that may be contained in any record held by a public hospital system outside of a medical records information system that alone or compiled, or under circumstances in which the patient information combined with other information could allow for patient identification, and also in compliance with State and federal medical privacy laws and regulations.
Title
FOIA-MEDICAL RECORDS
Sponsors
Rep. Robyn Gabel [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-15 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
5 | 140 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |