IL HB4642 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 1961 relating to computer tampering. In addition to other elements of the offense, provides that a person commits the offense when he or she knowingly and without the authorization of an account holder or in excess of the authority granted to him or to her accesses or causes to be accessed by any means an e-mail, instant messaging, or social networking website account. Defines "account holder". Establishes penalties. Amends the Harassing and Obscene Communications Act. Includes in the offense of harassment through electronic communications, knowingly and by any means making repeated, unwanted, and harassing communication to another person.
Title
HARASS- ELEC COM&COMPUTER TAMP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kirk W. Dillard |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2012 |
2012-05-30 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-000-000 |
2012-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2012 |
2012-05-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2012-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2012-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2012-04-26 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Johnson |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 17, 2012 |
2012-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael G. Connelly |
2012-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-29 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham |
2012-03-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2012-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted by Voice Vote |
2012-03-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-22 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2012-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2012-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole |
2012-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2012-03-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 009-000-000 |
2012-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2012-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Bost |
2012-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee |
2012-02-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias |
2012-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 135 | 1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 16D-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 17-55 | Amended Code | Citation Text |