IL HB4637 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-11-07 - Assigned to Executive
Pending: Senate Executive Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Local Land Resource Management Planning Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-17 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 80 N: 22 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-11-07SenateAssigned to Executive
2018-04-18SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-18SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-18SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2018-04-17SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading April 18, 2018
2018-04-17SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-17HouseMotion to Reconsider Vote - Withdrawn Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-17HouseMotion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-17HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 080-022-001
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-16HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto
2018-04-13HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-09HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; 011-000-000
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee; by Voice Vote
2018-04-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-09HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-03-21HouseAssigned to Government Consolidation & Modernization Committee
2018-02-07HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2018-02-07HouseFirst Reading
2018-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Sam Yingling

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
508051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback