IL HB4635 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Provides that a municipality may expend Motor Fuel Tax street or road funds (except Federal-aid funds) on streets or highways or sections of highways without prior review or approval of the Department of Transportation for routine maintenance activities as determined by the Department, including without limitation snow plowing, street cleaning, crack-sealing, and road patching; and routine and periodic roadway resurfacing activities (including grinding off the surface course of roads, but not involving expansions or reconstruction of more than 20% of the affected road bed). Effective immediately.
Title
HWY CD-MOTOR FUEL TAX FUNDS
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Beaubien [R] | Rep. Sandy Cole [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] | Rep. Sidney Mathias [R] |
Rep. JoAnn Osmond [R] | Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Ed Sullivan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca | |
2010-02-17 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandy Cole | |
2010-02-08 | Assigned to Transportation, Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee | |
2009-10-15 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente | |
2009-10-14 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ed Sullivan, Jr. | |
2009-10-14 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sidney H. Mathias | |
2009-10-14 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark H. Beaubien, Jr. | |
2009-10-08 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-10-08 | First Reading | |
2009-10-07 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4635&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HB/09600HB4635.htm |