IL HB4631 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-10-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that no procurement contract for the construction, alteration, operation, repair, maintenance, or improvement of any mass transit facility, or equipment thereof, in excess of $1,000,000 shall be awarded to or executed with any vendor that receives support from a nonmarket economy country, as defined under specified federal law. Provides that nothing in the provisions is intended to contravene any existing treaties, laws, trade agreements, or regulations of the United States or subsequent trade agreements entered into between any foreign countries and the State or the United States.
Title
PROCUREMENT-NONMARKET ECONOMY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2020-10-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2020-08-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2020-06-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2020-03-12 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2020-03-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2020-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2020-02-27 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nathan D. Reitz |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow |
2020-02-26 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2020-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2020-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4631&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4631.htm |