IL HB4628 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery, beginning on January 1, 2017 or as soon thereafter as is practical, to offer a special instant scratch-off game for the benefit of research pertaining to autism. Requires the net revenue from that game to be deposited into the Autism Research Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used by Department of Public Health for the purpose of making grants to organizations in Illinois that conduct research pertaining to the study, investigation, and experimentation ultimately resulting in a better understanding of autism spectrum disorders, as well as more effective treatment options. Authorizes the Department to adopt rules necessary to implement and administer the game. Amends the State Finance Act to create the Autism Research Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
LOTTERY-AUTISM SCRATCH-OFF
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2016-03-29 | House | To Finance Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-02-23 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2016-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dan Brady |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1605 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 1605 | 21.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 1605 | 9.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.875 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4628&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4628.htm |