IL HB4604 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-22 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0705
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following changes: In provisions concerning discrimination against employees, provides that a person may not discharge or in any way discriminate against an employee because the employee has reported potential violations of the Act to a member of management with authority to address the concerns (rather than discussed health or safety concerns with a co-worker or authorized employee representative).
Title
OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY-VARIOUS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0705 |
2022-04-22 | House | Effective Date April 22, 2022; ; some provisions effective January 1, 2023 |
2022-04-22 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-04-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2022 |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 015-000-000 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Suzy Glowiak Hilton |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-01 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2022-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 026-000-000 |
2022-02-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-02-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-02-09 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Labor & Commerce Committee; 027-000-000 |
2022-02-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Labor & Commerce Committee; by Voice Vote |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-03 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2022-02-01 | House | Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 219 | 100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 110 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
820 | 219 | 90 | Amended Code | Citation Text |