IL HB4597 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $24,591,400 from the Education Assistance Fund to the Illinois Mathematics and Science Academy to meet its ordinary and contingent expenses for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025. Appropriates $5,925,000 from the IMSA Income Fund to the Illinois Mathematics and Science Academy to meet its ordinary and contingent expenses for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2025. Effective July 1, 2024.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$OCE-IMSA

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2024-06-29HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2024-03-12HouseRe-assigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2024-02-28HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
2024-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2024-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2024-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Barbara Hernández

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback