IL HB4597 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act and Illinois Vehicle Code to provide for the issuance of Illinois State Police Memorial Park license plates. Creates the Illinois State Police Memorial Park Fund as a special fund in the State treasury. Provides that the applicant shall pay an additional fee of $25 for original issuance of the plates, of which $10 shall be deposited into the Illinois State Police Memorial Park Fund and $15 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that an additional fee of $25 shall be charged for each renewal, of which $23 shall be deposited into the Illinois State Police Memorial Park Fund and $2 shall be deposited into the Secretary of State Special License Plate Fund. Provides that money in the State Police Memorial Park Fund shall be paid as grants to the Illinois State Police Heritage Foundation, Inc. for specified purposes. Effective immediately.
Title
VEH CD-POLICE MEMORIAL PLATES
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Sacia [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-27 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2012-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Sacia |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 5.811 | New Code | See Bill Text |
625 | 5 | 3-699 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4597&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4597.htm |