IL HB4586 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-21)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-21)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by the discharge of a firearm, he or she knowingly causes great bodily harm or permanent disability or disfigurement to an individual whom the person knows to be a Department on Aging Adult Protective Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 1 felony. Provides that a person also commits aggravated battery when, in committing a battery, other than by discharge of a firearm, he or she knows the individual battered to be a Department on Aging Adult Protective Services employee: (1) performing his or her official duties; (2) battered to prevent performance of his or her official duties; or (3) battered in retaliation for performing his or her official duties. Provides that a violation is a Class 2 felony.
Title
CRIM CODE-AGG BAT-EMPLOYEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-05-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick |
2018-04-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Remains in Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Do Pass as Amended - Lost Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 005-006-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-12 | House | Reported Back To Judiciary - Criminal Committee; |
2018-04-12 | House | Recommends Do Pass Subcommittee/ Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 003-002-000 |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Randy E. Frese |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tim Butler |
2018-04-10 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Judiciary - Criminal Committee; Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-04-09 | House | To Sentencing, Penalties and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee |
2018-04-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jim Durkin |
2018-03-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-03-08 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael D. Unes |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terri Bryant |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2018-02-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-3.05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |