IL HB4585 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that any person convicted of a first offense of aggravated fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer is guilty of a Class 2 felony (instead of a Class 4 felony). Provides that any person convicted of a second or subsequent offense of aggravated fleeing or attempting to elude a police officer is guilty of a Class 1 felony (instead of a Class 3 felony).
Title
VEH CD – AGG FLEEING & ELUDING
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Elik [R] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Jackie Haas [R] | Rep. Dan Ugaste [R] |
Rep. Chris Bos [R] | Rep. Bradley Stephens [R] | Rep. Daniel Swanson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2022-01-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jackie Haas |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bradley Stephens |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Bos |
2022-01-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Ugaste |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-18 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Amy Elik |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-204.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4585&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4585.htm |