IL HB4584 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act, the Motor Fuel Tax Law, the Emergency Telephone System Act, the Riverboat Gambling Act, and the Video Gaming Act. Provides that, in the absence of an appropriation for any State fiscal year, moneys that are required to be distributed to units of local government and other entities from the State and Local Sales Tax Reform Fund, the Motor Fuel Tax Fund, the State Gaming Fund, the Local Government Video Gaming Distributive Fund, and the Statewide 9-1-1 Fund are subject to a continuing appropriation. Effective immediately.
Title
USE/OCC-MOTOR FUEL-LOCAL GOV
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2018-02-28 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 10 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 40 | 75 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 505 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
50 | 750 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4584&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4584.htm |