IL HB4582 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Finance Act. Provides for the transfer of certain moneys into the Audit Expense Fund. Effective immediately.
Title
FINANCE-FUND TRANSFERS
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Crespo [D] | Sen. Elgie Sims [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2024-04-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 30, 2024 |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2024-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-000-000 |
2024-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2024-04-12 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-General Services Committee; 015-000-000 |
2024-04-05 | House | Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Extended-Rule May 24, 2024 |
2024-02-28 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-General Services Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 105 | 6z-27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |