IL HB4569 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0637
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0637
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Gasoline Storage Act. Provides that each facility used for: (i) agricultural purposes at an agriculture site; (ii) refueling construction equipment at a construction site; or (iii) parking, operating, or maintaining a commercial vehicle fleet may store up to 12,000 gallons of any single type of fuel for dispensing in aboveground storage tanks that are constructed of steel, made vapor tight, and outside of buildings. Effective immediately.
Title
ABOVEGROUND FUEL STORAGE
Sponsors
Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst [R] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Tony McCombie [R] | Rep. Christopher Davidsmeyer [R] |
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Michael Connelly [R] | Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Sen. Steven Landek [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0637 |
2018-07-27 | House | Effective Date July 27, 2018 |
2018-07-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 108-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2018-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Koehler |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Environment and Conservation; 006-000-000 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Environment and Conservation |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Environment and Conservation; 005-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Assigned to Environment and Conservation |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-03-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 106-000-000 |
2018-03-01 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-03-01 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-02-27 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment; 014-000-000 |
2018-02-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment; by Voice Vote |
2018-02-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Environment |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Environment |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 15 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |