IL HB4563 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Invest in Kids Act. Provides that contributions to a school district foundation are also qualified contributions under the Act. Provides that taxpayers who make contributions to a school district foundation are also eligible for a property tax credit. Provides that the term "contribution" means a donation made by the taxpayer during the taxable year for providing scholarships or support (currently, scholarships only). Contains provisions concerning the calculation of the credit or abatement for contributions to school district foundations and the aggregate amount of the credit and abatement available for those contributions. Amends the School Code. Provides that payments under the evidence-based funding formula shall be reduced by the amount of qualified contributions received by the applicable school district foundation under the Invest in Kids Act. Effective immediately.
Title
INVEST KIDS-SCHOLARSHIP ORGS
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Breen [R] | Rep. Keith Wheeler [R] | Rep. Margo McDermed [R] | Rep. Allen Skillicorn [R] |
Rep. Patricia Bellock [R] | Rep. Avery Bourne [R] | Rep. Christine Winger [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-10 | House | Motion Withdrawn Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Christine Winger |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Revenue & Finance Committee; Rep. Peter Breen |
2018-03-01 | House | To Scholarship Tax Credit Oversight Subcommittee |
2018-02-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-02-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2018-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-06 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 18-8.15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 30 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 40 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4563&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4563.htm |