IL HB4554 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0772
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code. Provides that individual or group policies of accident and health insurance amended, delivered, issued, or renewed in this State after the effective date of the amendatory Act shall provide coverage for all drugs that are approved for marketing by the federal Food and Drug Administration and that are recommended by the federal Public Health Service or the United States Centers for Disease Control and Prevention for pre-exposure prophylaxis and related pre-exposure prophylaxis services, including, but not limited to, HIV and sexually transmitted infection screening, treatment for sexually transmitted infections, medical monitoring, assorted labs, and counseling to reduce the likelihood of HIV infection among individuals who are not infected with HIV but who are at high risk of HIV infection. Provides that the provision does not require a policy of accident and health insurance to provide coverage for clinical trials relating to any drug for pre-exposure prophylaxis for HIV. Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Provides that upon federal approval, the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall provide similar coverage. Effective January 1, 2017.
Title
INS CD-PREVENTATIVE HIV DRUGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-22 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0772 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 050-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 19, 2016 |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 006-000-000 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading May 4, 2016 |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-22 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2016-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted |
2016-04-21 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted |
2016-04-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Insurance Committee; 022-000-000 |
2016-04-18 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2016-04-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 021-001-000 |
2016-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2016-03-08 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 356z.24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
305 | 5 | 5-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |