IL HB4539 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on December 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-03 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Navigator Certification Act to provide that the education and certification requirements for certified application counselors shall be substantially similar to the certification requirements for navigators under the Act.
Title
NAVIGATOR CERT-COUNSELORS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-03 | House | Session Sine Die |
2014-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Darlene J. Senger |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. JoAnn D. Osmond |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dwight Kay |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sandra M. Pihos |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine Hammond |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello |
2014-02-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2014-02-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2014-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2014-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 121 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4539&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4539.htm |