IL HB4536 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0853
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-14 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0853
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Tax Increment Allocation Redevelopment Act in the Illinois Municipal Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
LOCAL GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-14 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0853 |
2018-08-14 | House | Effective Date August 14, 2018 |
2018-08-14 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-002-000 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2018 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Do Pass Revenue; 005-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 24, 2018 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 103-000-000 |
2018-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-04-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-11 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Revenue & Finance Committee; 011-000-000 |
2018-04-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Revenue & Finance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-06 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2018-03-21 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-02 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
65 | 5 | 11-74.4-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |