IL HB4535 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Prohibits additional fees in excess of the applicable registration fee for the issuance or renewal of military special registration plates.
Title
VEH CD-MILITARY PLATE FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts |
2024-02-14 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-19 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Bradley Fritts |