IL HB4532 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Universities Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires the System to provide advance notice to a participant in the self-managed plan of the participant's obligation to direct the investment of employee and employer contributions into one or more investment funds selected by the System at the time he or she makes his or her initial retirement plan selection. Provides that if a participant in the self-managed plan fails to direct the investment of employee and employer contributions into the various investment options offered to the participant when making his or her initial retirement election choice, the System shall invest the employee and employer contributions in a default investment fund on behalf of the participant, and the investment shall be deemed to have been made at the participant's investment direction. Provides that the participant has the right to transfer account balances out of the default investment fund during time periods designated by the System. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-SURS-SELF MANAGED PLAN
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Sente [D] | Rep. Elaine Nekritz [D] | Rep. Jeanne Ives [R] | Rep. Michael Zalewski [D] |
Rep. Stephanie Kifowit [D] | Rep. Jerry Costello [D] | Rep. Sheri Jesiel [R] | Sen. Daniel Biss [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 30, 2016 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2016-04-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-15 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jeanne M Ives |
2016-04-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-04-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente |
2016-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 009-000-000 |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 15-158.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |