IL HB4522 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0770
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on August 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0770
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that municipalities may fix, charge, and collect fees not exceeding the reasonable cost of the service for all services rendered by a volunteer municipal fire department or a volunteer firefighter of any municipal fire department for persons, businesses, and other entities who are not residents of the municipality. Sets limits on the amount of fees that may be fixed, charged, and collected. Provides that the new provisions do not allow a fee to be fixed, charged, or collected that is not allowed under any contract that a fire department has entered into with another entity, including, but not limited to, fire protection districts. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-FIRE REIMBURSEMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-30 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 85 N: 27 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0770 |
2016-08-12 | House | Effective Date August 12, 2016 |
2016-08-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 073-042-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 073-042-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 009-001-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Counties & Townships Committee; 009-001-000 |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Counties & Townships Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Counties & Townships Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-05-31 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2016-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2016-05-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-001 |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Clayborne |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2016-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Local Government; 009-000-000 |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2016 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Local Government; 011-000-000 |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Local Government |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 085-027-000 |
2016-04-07 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-03 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Donald L. Moffitt |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-03 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Counties & Townships Committee; 008-003-000 |
2016-02-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. |
2016-02-23 | House | Assigned to Counties & Townships Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |