IL HB4518 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-31 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Health Facilities Planning Act. Clarifies that health care facilities include hospitals, nursing homes, ambulatory surgical treatment centers, or kidney disease treatment centers maintained by the State or any department or agency thereof, whether or not they are licensed by the Department of Public Health. Provides that the Department of Public Health shall provide operational support to the Health Facilities and Services Review Board as agreed to in the Intergovernmental Agreement between the Department and the State Board. Provides that no later than 90 days after a discontinuation of a health facility or a discontinuation of a category of service, the applicant for a certificate of exemption must submit a statement to the State Board certifying that the discontinuation is complete. Provides that if a public hearing concerning change of ownership or discontinuation of a health facility or a category of service is held, all interested persons attending the hearing shall be given a reasonable opportunity to present their positions in writing or orally. Removes language concerning certificates of recognition. Removes language concerning the Specialized Mental Health Rehabilitation Act. Makes conforming changes.
Title
HEALTH FACILITIES PLANNING
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 99 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2016-05-27 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016 |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 11, 2016 |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 4, 2016 |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 007-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 20, 2016 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-013-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2016-04-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-05 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000 |
2016-04-05 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2016-04-04 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2016-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-25 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3960 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3960 | 8.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |