IL HB4516 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Human Services Act. Requires the Department of Human Services, in consultation with other specified State agencies, to conduct a public information campaign to educate immigrants, refugees, asylum seekers, and other noncitizens residing in Illinois of their rights under the U.S. Constitution and Illinois laws that apply regardless of immigration status. Requires the public information campaign to include resources and contact information for organizations that can aid residents in protecting and enforcing these rights. Requires the Department of Human Services, in consultation with the Department of Transportation and other agencies, when necessary, to post resources and other information regarding immigrant, refugee, and asylum seekers' rights in high-traffic public areas, including, but not limited to, train stations, airports, and highway rest stops. Permits the Department of Human Services to adopt rules or joint rules with other agencies to implement the requirements of the amendatory Act.
Title
DHS-IMMIGRANT RIGHTS
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz [D] | Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez [D] | Rep. Kelly Cassidy [D] | Rep. Theresa Mah [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Fiscal Note Filed |
2020-03-03 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-03-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2020-02-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2020-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2020-02-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-002-000 |
2020-02-26 | House | Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Terri Bryant |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-04 | House | First Reading |
2020-02-04 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4516&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4516.htm |