IL HB4516 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0903
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on August 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0903
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning predatory criminal sexual assault of a child. Provides that in order for the offense to be committed by the act of contact between the sex organ or anus of one person and the part of the body of another, the contact must be for the purpose of sexual gratification or arousal of the victim or the accused.
Title
PREDATORY CRIM SEX ASSAULT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-03 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0903 |
2014-08-15 | House | Effective Date August 15, 2014 |
2014-08-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2014-06-18 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-20 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2014 |
2014-05-07 | Senate | Second Reading |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 1, 2014 |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 007-000-000 |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Monique D. Davis |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol A. Sente |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2014-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-25 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2014-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-24 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary; 014-000-000 |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary; by Voice Vote |
2014-03-24 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-03-21 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
2014-02-11 | House | Assigned to Judiciary |
2014-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emily McAsey |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 11-1.40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12-14.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |