IL HB4512 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that daily storage charges for impounded vehicles shall not begin to accrue until 5 days after the vehicle is towed and shall not exceed the maximum daily storage rate authorized by the Illinois Commerce Commission. Provides that at the time a vehicle is towed or within 5 days thereafter, the county or municipality shall notify by certified mail the lienholder of record, lessor, and the owner, lessee, or person identifying himself or herself as the owner or lessee of the vehicle, or any person who is found to be in control of the vehicle at the time of the alleged offense, of the fact of the seizure, and of the vehicle owner's or lessee's right to an administrative hearing. Provides that a lienholder or lessor shall be entitled to take possession of an impounded vehicle, and defer payment of any applicable administrative fees, upon submission of certain documents and fees to the municipality or its designated agent. Provides that upon a request to obtain possession of an impounded vehicle, a municipality or its agent shall provide a lienholder or lessor an opportunity to view the vehicle and provide a statement in writing setting forth the amount of the applicable administrative, towing, and storage fees. Makes conforming changes.
Title
VEH CD-VEHICLE IMPOUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-29 | House | To Towing Oversight Subcommittee |
2016-03-23 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-26 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-208.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4512&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB4512.htm |