IL HB4501 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-13 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-13 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Assembly Operations Act. Provides that on and after the effective date of this amendatory Act, the General Assembly shall, by joint resolution, establish a revenue estimate for the following State fiscal year by April 30th of each year. Effective immediately.
Title
GA-REVENUE ESTIMATE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | Tabled |
2018-04-13 | House | Tabled Pursuant to Rule 22(g)-5 |
2018-04-13 | House | Motion Do Not Pass Executive Committee; 003-002-000; -SUBCOMMITTEE |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2018-04-12 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-12 | House | To Gaming Subcommittee |
2018-04-11 | House | Motion Filed to Discharge Committee Executive Committee; Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
2018-03-07 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2018-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Keith R. Wheeler |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4501&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4501.htm |