IL HB4498 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-09-29 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends various Acts to reinstate monetary bail that was abolished, effective January 1, 2023, by Public Act 101-652. Effective immediately.
Title
RESTORE MONETARY BAIL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin McLaughlin |
2022-09-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2022-02-18 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-01-21 | House | First Reading |
2022-01-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2022-01-13 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4498&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB4498.htm |