IL HB4488 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Drycleaner Environmental Response Trust Fund Act. Provides that, if the coverage of an owner or operator under the insurance account ceases for a reason other than the submittal of a claim on that account or the existence of an emergency or emergency action, then the owner or operator may reenroll in the program of coverage provided through the account by paying an annual premium calculated using the same risk basis as on the date that the owner or operator was last covered under the account. Effective immediately.
Title
DRYCLEANER-FUND-REENROLLMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-30 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-03-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2012-03-07 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 016-000-000 |
2012-02-15 | House | Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee |
2012-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael W. Tryon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 135 | 45 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4488&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4488.htm |