IL HB4478 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Physical Therapy Act. Provides that a licensed physical therapist may provide physical therapy without a referral only if the physical therapist is at least 21 years of age and holds a master or doctorate degree or has completed at least 2 years of practical experience as a licensed physical therapist. Provides that a physical therapist shall refer a patient to a physician, dentist, advanced practice nurse, physician assistant, or podiatrist if the physical therapist has (i) reasonable cause to believe that symptoms or conditions are present that require services beyond the scope of the practice of physical therapy or (ii) provided physical therapy treatment and upon examination or reexamination the same condition that the person sought physical therapy does not demonstrate objective, measurable, functional improvement within a period of 90 consecutive days. Removes having treated ailments of human beings as a licensed physical therapist independent of a documented referral or a documented current and relevant diagnosis from a physician, dentist, advanced practice nurse, physician assistant, or podiatrist, and having failed to notify the physician, dentist, advanced practice nurse, physician assistant, or podiatrist who established a documented current and relevant diagnosis that the patient is receiving physical therapy pursuant to that diagnosis from the list of occurrences upon which the Department of Financial and Professional Regulation may base the decision to take disciplinary action. Effective immediately.
Title
PHYSICAL THERAPY-REFERRALS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-03-09 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2012-02-21 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2012-02-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Franco Coladipietro |
2012-02-06 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2012-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2012-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 90 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
225 | 90 | 8.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4478&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB4478.htm |