IL HB4477 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
Pending: House Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Managed Care Reform and Patient Rights Act. Requires health insurance carriers that provide coverage for prescription drugs to ensure that, within service areas and levels of coverage specified by federal law, at least half of individual and group plans meet one or more of the following criteria: apply a pre-deductible and flat-dollar copayment structure to the entire drug benefit, limit a beneficiary's monthly out-of-pocket financial responsibility for prescription drugs to a specified amount, or limit a beneficiary's annual out-of-pocket financial responsibility for prescription drugs to a specified amount. Provides that all plans for prescription drugs offered under the amendatory Act must be clearly and appropriately named, marketed in the same manner as other plans offered by the health insurance carrier, and offered for purchase to any individual and group plan sponsor. Effective January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INS-PRESCRIPTION DRUG BENEFITS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2020-06-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2020-05-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2020-05-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2020-03-12HouseAssigned to Prescription Drug Affordability & Accessibility Committee
2020-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller
2020-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2020-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2020-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2020-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2020-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2020-03-05HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2020-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2020-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Diane Pappas
2020-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2020-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2020-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2020-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2020-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2020-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2020-02-20HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2020-02-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2020-02-04HouseFirst Reading
2020-02-04HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Gregory Harris

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21513445.3New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback