IL HB4474 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code, the Township Code, the Illinois Municipal Code, and the Fire Protection District Act. Provides that a nongovernmental entity with which a county, township, municipality, or fire protection district contracts to furnish fire protection services that displays a logo of the unit of local government on the entity's vehicles or uniform shall conspicuously display on all vehicles and uniforms a disclosure with specified information. Defines "vehicle". Provides that a violation is a business offense with a $1,000 fine per occurrence. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE DEPT CONTRACTOR LOGOS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Fire & Emergency Services Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-5002 | New Code | See Bill Text |
55 | 5 | Div. 5-5 heading | Amended Code | Citation Text |
60 | 1 | 200-20 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-6-9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 705 | 11a-5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4474&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4474.htm |