IL HB4467 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Dental Practice Act. Provides that a dental hygienist may be employed or retained by a health care facility, program, or nonprofit organization to perform dental hygiene services without the patient first being examined by a licensed dentist if the dental hygienist (i) has engaged in active practice of clinical dental hygiene for a minimum of 2,400 hours in the past 18 months or a career total of 3,000 hours, (ii) has entered into a collaborative agreement with a licensed dentist, (iii) had documented participation in course in infection control and medical emergencies, and (iv) maintains current CPR certification. Authorizes the dental hygienist to perform limited specified services. Provides that a licensed dentist may not have a collaborative agreement with more than 2 dental hygienist unless otherwise authorized by the Board. Provides that the collaborative agreement must (i) include certain provisions and it must be signed and maintained by the dentist, the dental hygienist, and the facility, program, or organization, (ii) be reviewed yearly, and (iii) be made available to the Board upon request. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DENTAL PRACT ACT-HYGIENIST

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-01-08HouseSession Sine Die
2012-08-03HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2012-04-25HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2012-03-09HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2012-03-09HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2012-03-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Esther Golar
2012-03-08HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2012-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2012-03-08HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
2012-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rosemary Mulligan
2012-02-06HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2012-01-30HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2012-01-30HouseFirst Reading
2012-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2252518Amended CodeCitation Text
225254Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback