IL HB4465 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Retailers' Occupation Tax Act. In a provision concerning the rate of tax, provides that the definition "prescription and nonprescription medicine and drugs" includes cannabis or cannabis-infused products purchased from a dispensing organization under the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act by a cardholder under the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Act. Amends the Cannabis Regulation and Tax Act. Provides that the tax imposed under the provisions is not imposed on cannabis-infused product that is subject to tax under the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Program Act or cannabis or cannabis-infused product sold to a cardholder under the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Program Act. Effective January 1, 2026.
Title
MEDICAL CANNABIS-TAX
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-04-05 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2024-03-27 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-01-16 | House | First Reading |
2024-01-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 120 | 2-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 705 | 65-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4465&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB4465.htm |