IL HB4441 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Mental Health and Developmental Disabilities Code. Provides that counseling services or psychotherapy on an outpatient basis provided to a civilly committed minor 12 years of age or older shall be provided in compliance with the Professional Counselor and Clinical Professional Counselor Licensing and Practice Act, the Clinical Social Work and Social Work Practice Act, or the Clinical Psychologist Licensing Act (currently, the counseling services or psychotherapy must be provided in compliance with the Professional Counselor and Clinical Professional Counselor Licensing and Practice Act or the Clinical Psychologist Licensing Act). Effective immediately.
Title
MHDDC-COUNSELING SERVICES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-13 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-02-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2018-02-13 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2018-02-12 | House | Assigned to Mental Health Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
405 | 5 | 3-501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4441&GAID=14&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/HB/10000HB4441.htm |