IL HB4428 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0618
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Grade A Pasteurized Milk and Milk Products Act. Provides that the Department of Public Health or a unit of local government electing to administer and enforce the Act shall provide a dairy farm with a paper copy of the dairy farm's inspection report.
Title
MILK INSPECTIONS-PAPER COPIES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-20 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0618 |
2018-07-20 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2019 |
2018-07-20 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-001-000 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2018 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Public Health; 008-000-000 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Assigned to Public Health |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-10 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 012-000-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-02 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to Human Services Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Charles Meier |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 635 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |