IL HB4425 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-28 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0638
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Requires the Department of Children and Family Services to determine the military status of each parent or guardian who is named as the alleged perpetrator in a child abuse or neglect report. Provides that if the Department determines that a child's parent or guardian is a service member, the Department shall notify a Department of Defense Family Advocacy Program that there is an allegation of abuse or neglect against the parent or guardian that is open for investigation.
Title
DCFS-ABUSE RPT-SERVICE MEMBER
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-28 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0638 |
2016-07-28 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2017 |
2016-07-28 | House | Governor Approved |
2016-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2016 |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Second Reading |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2016 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Do Pass Human Services; 005-000-000 |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-04-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 19, 2016 |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2016-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2016-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 105-000-000 |
2016-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-14 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2016-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2016-04-13 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000 |
2016-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2016-03-02 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2016-02-16 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2016-01-15 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2016-01-15 | House | First Reading |
2016-01-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |