IL HB4423 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Grant Accountability and Transparency Act. Provides that the Governor's Office of Management and Budget shall provide for alerts by email to be provided to the public upon the posting of new funding opportunities on the Catalog of State Financial Assistance as maintained on the website of the Governor's Office of Management and Budget. Provides that persons seeking to be alerted to the posting of new funding opportunities may do so by providing an email address to which such information may be sent. Provides that the Governor's Office of Management and Budget shall also make available electronically a monthly digest of funding opportunities utilizing the information required to be made available in the Catalog of State Financial Assistance for funding opportunities. Effective immediately.
Title
GOMB-FINANCIAL ASSIST ALERTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-03-17 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading |
2020-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4423&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB4423.htm |