IL HB4413 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-4)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the General Provisions Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that any open meeting of the board of trustees of a retirement system or pension fund or any committee established by a retirement system or pension fund must be broadcast to the public and maintained in real-time on the retirement system's or pension fund's website using a high-speed Internet connection. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement by the State. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-BROADCAST MEETINGS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-18 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 71 N: 39 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Postponed - State Government |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - State Government |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Andy Manar |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 071-039-001 |
2018-04-18 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-12 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel & Pensions Committee; 011-002-001 |
2018-04-12 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel & Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2018-04-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
2018-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-02-26 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2018-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Carol Ammons |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.42 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.16 | Amended Code | Citation Text |