IL HB4413 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-07 - Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Youthbuild Act. Directs the Department of Juvenile Justice, the Department of Commerce and Economic Opportunity, the Department of Corrections, the Department of Transportation, and the Department of Human Services (instead of only the Secretary of Human Services) to make grants to applicants for the purpose of carrying out Youthbuild programs. Effective immediately.
Title
DCEO-DHS-DOC-YOUTHBUILD GRANTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-07 | House | Tabled |
2014-05-07 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2014-05-06 | House | Motion Filed - Table Bill/Resolution Pursuant to Rule 60(b), Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-05-05 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2014 |
2014-05-05 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-000 |
2014-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2014-04-09 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2014-03-27 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2014-03-26 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 013-006-000 |
2014-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2014-03-03 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | First Reading |
2014-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1315 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=4413&GAID=12&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=85&GA=98 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/98/HB/09800HB4413.htm |